Global Patent Index - EP 1045473 A3

EP 1045473 A3 2001-04-11 - Multibeam phased array antenna system

Title (en)

Multibeam phased array antenna system

Title (de)

Multibeam-Phasenarray-Antenneneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'alignement en phase pour antenne multibeam

Publication

EP 1045473 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105188 A

Priority

DE 19917202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045473A2] The antenna arrangement has radiator elements (SE1...) in a matrix, each driven by beam shaping devices (BFN), a number of signal dividers corresponding to the number of transmitted or received signals, beam shaping devices arranged in a bounded path after each radiator element and connected to the signal dividers via multiple connections and a signal combiner per line of beam shapers via which the radiator elements can be coupled directly or if appropriate via an amplifier (VS1...) and/or filter (Fi1...).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/00; H01Q 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/0025 (2013.01); H01Q 3/26 (2013.01); H01Q 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045473 A2 20001018; EP 1045473 A3 20010411; DE 19917202 A1 20001019; US 6362780 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061111

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060630

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESAT-SPACECOM GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI