Global patent index - EP 1045474 A2

EP 1045474 A2 2000-10-18 - Spring clamp

Title (en)

Spring clamp

Title (de)

Zugfederklemme

Title (fr)

Pince à ressort

Publication

EP 1045474 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103009 A

Priority

DE 19916755 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical terminal clamp has a formed spring clip metal pressing (1) that has an aperture (6) into which is located a clamping conductor bar (2). This has serrated teeth (8). When an end of a wire is inserted (1), the spring clip presses a bar against the wire.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Zugfederklemme ist die untere Begrenzung der Durchtrittsöffnung (6) im Klemmschenkel (5) der Zugfederklemme (1) durch zum freien Ende des Klemmschenkels hin konvergierende Schrägen (7) leiterzentrierend ausgebildet, so daß automatisch beim Anschließen eines einzelnen oder mehrerer Leiter in dieser Verjüngungszone auf der Unterseite der Stromschiene (2) eine Leiterzentrierung und ­ kompaktierung erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4845 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045474 A2 20001018; EP 1045474 A3 20020213; DE 19916755 A1 20001019; DE 19916755 B4 20070628; US 6270383 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060831

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI