Global Patent Index - EP 1045477 A2

EP 1045477 A2 2000-10-18 - Electrical connection device, especially for ceiling light fixtures such as longitunial luminaires or cassette luminaires and apparatus housing therefor

Title (en)

Electrical connection device, especially for ceiling light fixtures such as longitunial luminaires or cassette luminaires and apparatus housing therefor

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussvorrichtung, insbes. für Deckenleuchten wie Langfeld- oder Cassettenleuchten sowie Gerätegehäuse darfür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement électrique, en particulier pour des luminaires de plafond tel que des luminaires longitudinals ou à cassettes ainsi que les boîtiers d'appareillage associés

Publication

EP 1045477 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106901 A

Priority

DE 19917138 A

Abstract (en)

The connector (10) has an installation body of insulating material for insertion into a cut-out (19) in the equipment housin The installation body, which holds a connection terminal block inside the equipment, is in the form of a holding frame anchored flush with or recessed into the equipment housing with apertures for holding the terminal block An Independent claim is also included for a housing for an electrical connector.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist Anschlussvorrichtung für elektrische Geräte, insbes. für Leuchten wie Langfeld- oder Cassetten-Deckenleuchten, umfassend einen Einbaukörper aus Isolierstoff zum Einsatz in einen Ausschnitt des Gerätegehäuses, wobei der Einbaukörper im Geräteinnern einen Anschlussklemmenblock bereithält. Zweck der Erfindung ist insbes. die Erleichterung der Handhabungen bei Fertigung und Verdrahtung des Geräts. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, dass der Einbaukörper als im Gerätegehäuseausschnitt bündig oder versenkt zu verankernder Halterahmen ausgebildet ist, dessen Ausnehmung zur Aufnahme und Halterung des Anschlussklemmenblocks ausgebildet ist. Bevorzugt ist der rechteckige Halterahmen an seinen beiden Schmalseiten mit jeweils einer Rampe versehen. Diese Rampen führen vom Rand des Rahmens zu den eingesenkt im Gehäuse liegenden und nur von der Geräteaußenseite her zugänglichen Leitereinstecköffnungen. Jeweils zweite Leitereinstecköffnungen der Kontakte sind gehäuseintern auf der Rückseite der Rampen am Anschlussklemmenblock vorgesehen und nur vom Geräteinnern her zugänglich. Dank dieser Ausgestaltung sind die elektrischen Anschlüsse der Geräte wie auch Durchverdrahtungen auf einfache Weise ausführbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/006 (2013.01); H01R 9/2491 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045477 A2 20001018; EP 1045477 A3 20020320; DE 19917138 C1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20080828

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060405

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 9/24 A, 7H 01R 25/00 B, 7H 01R 13/74 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI