Global patent index - EP 1045562 A2

EP 1045562 A2 2000-10-18 - A Light-weight Internet Protocol Encapsulation (LIPE) scheme for multimedia traffic transport

Title (en)

A Light-weight Internet Protocol Encapsulation (LIPE) scheme for multimedia traffic transport

Title (de)

Ein Light-weight Internet Protocol Encapsulation (LIPE) Schema für Multimediaverkehrstransport

Title (fr)

Un schéma Light-weight Internet Protocol Encapsulation (LIPE) pour le transport de trafic multimedia

Publication

EP 1045562 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301583 A

Priority

US 26405399 A

Abstract (en)

A packet encapsulation scheme for multiplexing application sessions - Lightweight IP Encapsulation (LIPE) - is described. An LIPE packet comprises at least one multiplexing header (MH) and associated multimedia data packet (MDP). The LIPE packet uses UDP/IP as transport. An MH field further comprises a 16-bit a user identifier (UID) field, an 11 bit length indicator (LNG) field, a 1 bit "more" (M) field and an optional payload type/class of service (PT/CoS) field comprising 8 bits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04Q 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 65/607 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 65/608 (2013.01); H04L 65/80 (2013.01); H04L 69/04 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 69/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045562 A2 20001018; EP 1045562 A3 20030319; CA 2299141 A1 20000908; CA 2299141 C 20061212; JP 2000286894 A 20001013; US 6993021 B1 20060131

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20080828

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI