Global patent index - EP 1045623 A2

EP 1045623 A2 2000-10-18 - A dimmer and dimming lighting system

Title (en)

A dimmer and dimming lighting system

Title (de)

Dimmer und Beleuchtungssystem zum Dimmen

Title (fr)

Gradateur et dispositif d' éclairage variateur d'intensité

Publication

EP 1045623 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302926 A

Priority

IL 12940599 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a dimmable lighting system fed from a mains and connectable to at least one ballast and to at least one discharge lamp, the system including at least one switching component operable to connect the mains voltage to the lamp's circuit at certain periods of time and to provide a short circuit across the lamp's circuit between the periods of time, and a control circuit for sensing the mains voltage and selectively activating the switching component with reference to the mains voltage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/392; H05B 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3924 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045623 A2 20001018; EP 1045623 A3 20020206; AU 2768600 A 20001019; CA 2304301 A1 20001013; IL 129405 D0 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI