Global Patent Index - EP 1045660 A1

EP 1045660 A1 2000-10-25 - VACUUM CLEANER DUSTING BRUSH

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER DUSTING BRUSH

Title (de)

STAUBSAUGERMUNDSTÜCK

Title (fr)

SUCEUR D'ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 1045660 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900912 A

Priority

  • FR 9900024 W
  • FR 9800127 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773317A1] The invention concerns a vacuum cleaner dusting brush comprising a housing (10) capable of being connected to a suction tube via a connection sleeve (12), a bearing plate (14) located beneath the housing and having a suction channel (18), a suction aperture (16) located in the suction channel (18), a scraping member (28) located beneath the housing and rear wheels (24, 26), the coupling sleeve (12) pivot pin being located behind the axis of rotation (A) of said wheels and coinciding therewith. The scraping member (28) is fixed and continuously projects beneath the bearing plate, the resting plane (PS) of the dusting brush on the floor being defined by contact zones of the rear wheels (24, 26) and of the scraping member (28) with the floor and the bearing plate assembly being located recessed relative to said resting plane. The scraping member (28) only extends in the dusting brush longitudinal zone which, viewed relative to the suction aperture rear edge, is located at the dusting brush front.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0613 (2013.01); A47L 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773317 A1 19990709; FR 2773317 B1 20000331; DE 69906683 D1 20030515; DE 69906683 T2 20040304; EP 1045660 A1 20001025; EP 1045660 B1 20030409; ES 2196756 T3 20031216; PL 190259 B1 20051130; PL 341567 A1 20010423; TR 200001912 T2 20001221; WO 9934721 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070108

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060108

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2196756

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020312

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL