Global Patent Index - EP 1045732 A1

EP 1045732 A1 2000-10-25 - DEVICE FOR ISOLATING AN ELECTRO-CONDUCTIVE FLOWING MEDIUM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ISOLATING AN ELECTRO-CONDUCTIVE FLOWING MEDIUM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ISOLIEREN EINES ELEKTRISCH LEITENDEN STRÖMUNGSMEDIUMS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ISOLER UN MILIEU EN ECOULEMENT ELECTROCONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1045732 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966550 A

Priority

  • DE 9803693 W
  • DE 19756488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756488A1] Disclosed are a method and a device for isolating an electro-conductive flowing medium with different electrical potential on two points (13 and 15) along the flow path in a potential separation device. The invention is characterized in that the electro-conductive flowing medium is conveyed in the interior (18') of a freely projecting support (17') having at least one outlet (29). The support moves from a first or separating position and a coupling position for overflowing and vice versa. The outlet (29) is closed once the coupling position has been reached and remains closed thereafter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/1666 (2013.01); B05B 5/1616 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932231A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756488 A1 19990701; EP 1045732 A1 20001025; EP 1045732 B1 20031105; US 6422491 B1 20020723; WO 9932231 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121215

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LACTEC G.- FUR MODERNE LACKIERTECHNIK M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR ISOLATING AN ELECTRO-CONDUCTIVE FLOWING MEDIUM

2003-06-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR ISOLATING AN ELECTRO-CONDUCTIVE FLOWING MEDIUM

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020718

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB