Global patent index - EP 1045746 A1

EP 1045746 A1 2000-10-25 - AUTOMATIC CUTTING OF PIECES IN A SHEET MATERIAL

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC CUTTING OF PIECES IN A SHEET MATERIAL

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES SCHNEIDEN VON TEILEN AUS FOLIENFÖRMIGEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

COUPE AUTOMATIQUE DE PIECES DANS UNE MATIERE EN FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1045746 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99942987 A

Priority

  • FR 9902206 W
  • FR 9811541 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783191A1] The automatic cutter consists of a cutting table (10) which receives the material (30) in sheet form, a loading point (12) and a discharge point (16) of the cut out pieces. A supple impervious film (32) is applied to the sheet material up- stream of the cutting table and is held in position by the establishment of a depression on the surface of the cutting table. After cutting, the skeleton of the film (32') is separated from the sheet material downstream of the cutting table and recovered by rolling onto a mandrel (70). The cut-out parts of the film attached to the sheet material identify the cut material to be recovered at the discharge point from the rest of the cut material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; A41H 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/018 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0467 (2015.04); Y10T 83/207 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2074 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2185 (2015.04); Y10T 156/1054 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1084 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1343 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1348 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1378 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1788 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0015397A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783191 A1 20000317; FR 2783191 B1 20001215; DE 69902140 D1 20020822; DE 69902140 T2 20030320; EP 1045746 A1 20001025; EP 1045746 B1 20020717; ES 2179673 T3 20030116; US 2003121610 A1 20030703; US 6521074 B1 20030218; US 7024976 B2 20060411; WO 0015397 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2179673

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902140

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LECTRA SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE