Global Patent Index - EP 1045772 A3

EP 1045772 A3 2002-11-20 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MOVEABLE PARTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MOVEABLE PARTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSTELLEN VON BEWEGBAREN TEILEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE PIECES MOBILES

Publication

EP 1045772 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99944272 A

Priority

  • DE 9902050 W
  • DE 19851456 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19851456A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for adjusting moveable parts, especially parts of an automobile seat. The device comprises a motor (10) which can be connected to a mechanical adjustment device (12) and a pump (16) belonging to a pneumatic adjusting device (14) in order to drive them individually or jointly. According to the invention, the pneumatic adjusting device (14) has a pressure accumulator (17) that is impinged upon by a fluid and is connected to the pump (16), and a constant pressure can be maintained in the pneumatic adjusting device within a predetermined or predeterminable interval.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/08 (2006.01); F15B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/02 (2013.01); B60N 2/0232 (2013.01); B60R 16/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851456 A1 20000511; EP 1045772 A2 20001025; EP 1045772 A3 20021120; WO 0027666 A2 20000518; WO 0027666 A3 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60N 2/44 A

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE