Global Patent Index - EP 1045814 A1

EP 1045814 A1 2000-10-25 - LIMIT CONTROL DEVICE FOR FILLING A LIQUID STORAGE TANK

Title (en)

LIMIT CONTROL DEVICE FOR FILLING A LIQUID STORAGE TANK

Title (de)

FÜLLUNGSBEGRENZER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSLAGERBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

LIMITEUR DE REMPLISSAGE POUR CUVE DE STOCKAGE D'UN LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1045814 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98955722 A

Priority

  • FR 9802500 W
  • FR 9715955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772354A1] The invention concerns a limit control device for filling a liquid storage tank comprising a hollow upper body (1), a plunger tube (2) integral with said upper body (1), a valve (16) mounted in said hollow upper body (1) and capable of moving between an opening position and a closing position, a valve seat (17) arranged in said hollow upper body (1) and whereon said valve (16) is urged to rest in closing position, a floater (26) vertically mobile in a chamber (35) arranged at least partially inside the plunger tube (2). The invention is characterised in that said floater (26) is integral with a moving element (24) forming a piston, said moving element being displaced by thrust of the liquid acting on one of its ends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/36 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/367 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7426 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931011A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772354 A1 19990618; FR 2772354 B1 20000204; EP 1045814 A1 20001025; EP 1045814 B1 20011024; ES 2165707 T3 20020316; JP 2002508289 A 20020319; US 6318421 B1 20011120; WO 9931011 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111124

2013-06-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130603

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111123

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165707 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2001-10-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL