Global Patent Index - EP 1045826 A1

EP 1045826 A1 2000-10-25 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ISOPROPYL-METHYL- 2-(3-N-PROPOXYPHENOXY)ETHYL AMINE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ISOPROPYL-METHYL- 2-(3-N-PROPOXYPHENOXY)ETHYL AMINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ISOPROPYL-METHYL-¬2-(3-N-PROPOXYPHENOXY)ETHYL AMIN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ISOPROPYLMETHYL- 2-(3-N-PROPOXYPHENOXY)ETHYL AMINE

Publication

EP 1045826 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964599 A

Priority

  • SE 9802315 W
  • SE 9704834 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932430A1] The present invention relates to a novel process for the synthesis of isopropyl-methyl-[2-(3-n-propoxyphenoxy)ethyl]amine. Moreover, the present invention also relates to a novel intermediate and an optional purification step in the novel process. Additionally, the present invention also relates to the manufacture of a pharmaceutical formulation containing isopropyl-methyl-[2-(3-n-propoxyphenoxy)ethyl]amine and the use of purified isopropyl-methyl-[2-(3-n-propoxyphenoxy)ethyl]amine in medicine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 217/20; A61K 31/135

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 23/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 213/02 (2006.01); C07C 213/06 (2006.01); C07C 217/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 213/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 213/02 + C07C 217/20

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932430A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932430 A1 19990701; AR 017198 A1 20010822; AU 1989199 A 19990712; BR 9814377 A 20001010; CA 2314988 A1 19990701; CN 1283177 A 20010207; EE 200000369 A 20011217; EP 1045826 A1 20001025; HU 0100616 A2 20020529; ID 27591 A 20010412; IL 136825 D0 20010614; IS 5523 A 20000607; JP 2001526253 A 20011218; NO 20002944 A 20000608; NO 20002944 D0 20000608; PL 341438 A1 20010409; SE 9704834 D0 19971222; SK 8052000 A3 20010212; TR 200001976 T2 20001121; TW 436474 B 20010528; ZA 9811238 B 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ISOPROPYL-METHYL- 2-(3-N-PROPOXYPHENOXY)ETHYL AMINE

2007-07-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030600

2002-12-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000724;LV PAYMENT 20000724;MK PAYMENT 20000724;RO PAYMENT 20000724;SI PAYMENT 20000724