Global Patent Index - EP 1045890 A1

EP 1045890 A1 2000-10-25 - NATURAL RESIN FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

NATURAL RESIN FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

NATURHARZ-FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS DE RESINES NATURELLES

Publication

EP 1045890 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901540 A

Priority

  • CA 9900051 W
  • CA 2228418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938935A1] This invention is directed to a method of preparing a natural resin by liquefying wood, bark, forest residues, wood industry residues, or other biomass using fast pyrolysis in order to produce product vapours and char. Following removal of the char from the product vapours, a first set of compounds are removed from the product vapours by rapid quenching in order to obtain a remaining selected product vapour from which a natural resin is obtained. The natural resin comprises a total phenolic content from about 30 % to about 80 % (w/w), and is further characterized as having a pleasant smoky odour. The natural resin has surprisingly been found to be suitable for use within adhesive formulations without requiring any further extraction or fractionation procedures. Adhesives comprising up to 60 % natural resin have been prepared and tested in board production and found to exhibit similar properties associated with commercially available resins. The natural resin may substitute for phenol, or for both phenol and formaldehyde within phenol-containing resins. Similarly, the natural resin can replace a substantial part of the components within urea-containing resins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10C 5/00; C08G 16/02; C08H 5/04; C08L 97/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 16/02 (2006.01); C08H 8/00 (2010.01); C08L 61/06 (2006.01); C08L 61/24 (2006.01); C08L 97/02 (2006.01); C09J 161/06 (2006.01); C09J 161/24 (2006.01); C10B 53/02 (2006.01); C10C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08H 8/00 (2013.01); C08G 16/0293 (2013.01); C08L 61/06 (2013.01); C08L 61/24 (2013.01); C08L 97/02 (2013.01); C09J 161/06 (2013.01); C09J 161/24 (2013.01); C10B 53/02 (2013.01); C10C 5/00 (2013.01); Y02E 50/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 97/02 + C08L 2666/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938935A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938935 A1 19990805; AT 277989 T 20041015; AU 2145799 A 19990816; AU 753794 B2 20021031; BR 9908353 A 20001128; BR PI9908353 B1 20160412; CA 2228418 A1 19990730; DE 69920658 D1 20041104; DE 69920658 T2 20051013; DK 1045890 T3 20050131; EP 1045890 A1 20001025; EP 1045890 B1 20040929; ES 2230829 T3 20050501; MX PA00007421 A 20030801; NO 20003887 A 20001002; NO 20003887 D0 20000728; NO 324387 B1 20071001; PT 1045890 E 20050228

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140129

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140130

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140129

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-11-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-08 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040404531

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 277989 T

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-09-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ENSYN RENEWABLES INC.

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: FALLSGASSE 7, 9492 ESCHEN (LI)

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ENSYN RENEWABLES, INC.

- Free text: ENSYN RENEWABLES, INC.#20 PARK PLAZA, SUITE 400#BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS 02116 (US) -TRANSFER TO- ENSYN RENEWABLES, INC.#20 PARK PLAZA, SUITE 400#BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS 02116 (US)

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230829 T3

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040404531

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOGENSBERGER PATENT- & MARKENBUERO DR. BURKHARD BO

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-01-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2005-01-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920658 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSYN RENEWABLES, INC.

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSYN GROUP INC.

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE