Global Patent Index - EP 1045956 A1

EP 1045956 A1 2000-10-25 - A LOCKING DEVICE FOR ROLLER BLINDS

Title (en)

A LOCKING DEVICE FOR ROLLER BLINDS

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ROLLOS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR STORES

Publication

EP 1045956 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900445 A

Priority

  • DK 9900015 W
  • DK 1998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937876A1] A ratchet mechanism which uses balls lets the balls fall down radially according to the prior art, for locking between the drum (1) which is fitted to the roller blind tube and the immobilised shaft (2). According to the invention the drum (1) is provided with changed depressions which have protrusions (4', 5', 6') for prevention of this movement. The protrusions partly support the ball which at any given instant is topmost and hence enables a slow rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937876A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937876 A1 19990729; AU 1960899 A 19990809; DE 69939459 D1 20081016; DK 1998 A 19991001; EP 1045956 A1 20001025; EP 1045956 B1 20080903

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-08-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-03-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69939459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL

2008-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050831

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL