Global Patent Index - EP 1045957 A1

EP 1045957 A1 2000-10-25 - A ROTATION BLOCKING AND UN-BLOCKING MECHANISM FOR ROLLER BLINDS

Title (en)

A ROTATION BLOCKING AND UN-BLOCKING MECHANISM FOR ROLLER BLINDS

Title (de)

EIN ABROLL-BLOCKIER- UND ENTBLOCKUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR ROLLÄDEN

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE BLOCAGE ET DECLENCHEMENT DE ROTATION POUR STORES ROULANTS

Publication

EP 1045957 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99971890 A

Priority

  • DK 9900618 W
  • DK 144498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028187A1] In traditional roller blinds the blocking is released by a short pull in the bottom edge part whereby gravity frees the blocking element. This requires manual skills in order to avoid erratic handling. According to the invention the release may occur positively in that the blocking element is released by means of an operating cord or chain (S) which activates those arms (A) which already connect the chain wheel to the roller blind roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0028187A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028187 A1 20000518; AU 1150700 A 20000529; DE 69941286 D1 20091001; DK 1045957 T3 20091221; DK 144498 A 20000510; EP 1045957 A1 20001025; EP 1045957 B1 20090819; EP 1045957 B9 20100203

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151103

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-12-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69941286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-10-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL

2009-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A ROTATION BLOCKING AND UN-BLOCKING MECHANISM FOR ROLLER BLINDS

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030430

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI