Global Patent Index - EP 1045961 A1

EP 1045961 A1 2000-10-25 - CONICAL HONEYCOMB BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

CONICAL HONEYCOMB BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

KONISCHER WABENKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CORPS ALVEOLE CONIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1045961 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920692 A

Priority

  • DE 19819202 A
  • EP 9902586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819202A1] The invention relates to a conical honeycomb body (1), especially a catalyst support body for exhaust-gas systems of internal combustion engines, and a method for producing same which avoids the deformations occurring especially when fixing a conical lamellar body (2) in a conical jacket tube (3). To this end, clamping aids (7; 8; 9, 10; 11; 12; 13, 14) are arranged in the jacket tube (3) at a distance from its front openings (4, 5) and are configured such that at least in sections they have a ring shape. The preferred clamping aids (7; 8; 9, 10; 11; 12; 13, 14) provided for by the invention are advantageously characterized in that they allow for the economical production of conical honeycomb bodies (1) having greater mechanical strength. Their variants also make it possible to influence the function of the edge area of the conical honeycomb body (1) in a targeted manner. Especially beading (9, 11), necking (8, 12) and/or rings (7, 10) achieve, for example, a barrier effect so that no fluids are able to circulate in the channels situated in the edge area of the jacket tube (3) in which fluids would be otherwise be able to circulate. The front openings (4, 5) of the jacket tube (3) are free of inserted elements and can therefore be easily be welded to other components of the exhaust-gas system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2006.01); B21D 17/00 (2006.01); B21D 51/10 (2006.01); B21D 53/88 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/88 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); B21D 17/00 (2013.01); B21D 51/10 (2013.01); F01N 3/2842 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49345 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1234 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12382 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819202 A1 19991104; EP 1045961 A1 20001025; EP 1045961 B1 20020703; EP 1045961 B9 20021211; ES 2183549 T3 20030316; US 6613446 B1 20030902; WO 9956010 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160416

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, 30165 HANNOVER, DE

- Document: DE 59901919

2016-02-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901919

2016-02-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EMITEC GESELLSCHAFT FUER EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE MBH, 53797 LOHMAR, DE

- Document: DE 59901919

2016-02-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901919

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183549 T3

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901919 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT