Global patent index - EP 1045966 A1

EP 1045966 A1 2000-10-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AND MONITORING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AND MONITORING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN UND ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER ET SURVEILLER UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1045966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936349 A

Priority

  • DE 9901579 W
  • DE 19841151 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19841151A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for operating and monitoring an internal combustion engine. In at least one operating state the internal combustion engine is run on a lean air/fuel mixture and at least one quantity representing the degree of accelerator pedal application and one quantity representing engine speed are detected. In at least one operating state the internal combustion engine can be run only with an almost stoecchiometric or rich mixture and/or with a limited air supply. Operation of the internal combustion engine is monitored on the basis of at least one operating quantity of same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 31/00; F02D 41/08; F02D 41/12; F02D 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); F02D 35/0023 (2013.01); F02D 41/2454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014394A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841151 A1 20000316; BR 9906941 A 20001003; EP 1045966 A1 20001025; EP 1045966 B1 20020814; JP 2002524682 A 20020806; JP 4369621 B2 20091125; RU 2220307 C2 20031227; US 6357419 B1 20020319; WO 0014394 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140528

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT