Global Patent Index - EP 1045967 A1

EP 1045967 A1 2000-10-25 - PHASE RECOGNITION DEVICE

Title (en)

PHASE RECOGNITION DEVICE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR PHASENERKENNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE DE PHASE

Publication

EP 1045967 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948671 A

Priority

  • DE 9902267 W
  • DE 19844910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19844910A1] Disclosed is a phase recognition device for an internal combustion engine, whereby only one crankshaft signal sensor is provided and the phase signal is obtained by predeterminable suppression of injections for specific cylinders and simultaneous analysis of engine speed. If the engine speed characteristic is adjusted as expected during several suppressed injections for the same cylinder, it is assumed that synchronization is correct. If this condition is not met, synchronization is incorrect by 360 DEG KW, whereby said synchronization is modified.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06; F02D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 25/08 (2006.01); F02D 17/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02P 7/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02P 7/0675 (2013.01); F02D 41/0097 (2013.01); F02D 2041/0092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0019077A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19844910 A1 20000406; BR 9909572 A 20001219; EP 1045967 A1 20001025; EP 1045967 B1 20040114; JP 2002525494 A 20020813; RU 2230210 C2 20040610; WO 0019077 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150723

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150723

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150723

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908304

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908304 P 20040219

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030103

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE