Global Patent Index - EP 1045968 A1

EP 1045968 A1 2000-10-25 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1045968 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957951 A

Priority

  • DE 9903463 W
  • DE 19850587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850587A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine, especially for a motor vehicle, which is provided with a combustion chamber into which fuel can be injected in at least two different fuel injection modes. A control unit is provided for switching between the two modes. The control unit can also be used to switch to an intermediate mode (25) when switching between the two fuel injection modes (23, 24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/26 (2013.01); F02D 41/3064 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0026525A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850587 A1 20000504; EP 1045968 A1 20001025; EP 1045968 B1 20040421; JP 2002529639 A 20020910; WO 0026525 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909235

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909235

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE