Global Patent Index - EP 1045969 A1

EP 1045969 A1 2000-10-25 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1045969 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99960831 A

Priority

  • DE 9903435 W
  • DE 19850584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850584A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine, especially for a motor vehicle. Said internal combustion engine is provided with a combustion chamber into which fuel can be injected in at least two different operating modes. The internal combustion engine is provided with a control unit which switches between the operating modes subject to a desired operating mode. Said control unit can detect an operating mode requirement subject to the fact whether the individual operating modes are capable of producing the required torque ratio while keeping within predetermined lambda limits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1458 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0026524A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850584 A1 20000504; DE 59913820 D1 20061012; EP 1045969 A1 20001025; EP 1045969 B1 20060830; JP 2002529638 A 20020910; JP 4690549 B2 20110601; US 6467451 B1 20021022; WO 0026524 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913820 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030808

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE