Global Patent Index - EP 1045979 A1

EP 1045979 A1 2000-10-25 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1045979 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939928 A

Priority

  • DE 9901818 W
  • DE 19850387 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850387A1] The present invention relates to a fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines that comprises a valve body (1) with a guiding bore (9) in which a valve member (11) is guided so as to be capable of axial displacement in order to drive an injection cross section, and has its surface opposite the combustion chamber prestressed in the axial direction against a valve retaining body (7) through an intermediate plate (3). In the valve body (1), a pressure chamber (13) formed by the widening of the guiding bore (9) cross section can be filled with high-pressure fuel through a pressure channel (21) that extends through the valve body (1), the intermediate plate (3) and the valve retaining body (7). To this end, the partial area of the pressure channel (21) extending through the valve body (1) is made in the form of an inclined bore (23) having an inclination angle of between 15 and 35 degrees in the direction of the longitudinal axis of the fuel injection valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 55/008 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/03 (2013.01); F02M 2200/8015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850387 A1 20000504; EP 1045979 A1 20001025; EP 1045979 B1 20030910; JP 2002529641 A 20020910; US 6499676 B1 20021231; WO 0026528 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906946 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT