Global Patent Index - EP 1045984 A1

EP 1045984 A1 2000-10-25 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1045984 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99941118 A

Priority

  • US 9918434 W
  • US 13609098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0011344A1] A fuel injection system (10) includes a fuel body (12) having a compact fuel chamber (14) connected through individual flexible fuel tubes (26) with separate fuel injectors (28) mounted on the separate cylinder inlet passages of an engine. The system may have an integral fuel pressure regulator (30) or the regulator may be located separately, for example with the fuel pump in a vehicle fuel tank. The pressure regulator (30) may include a unitized diaphragm and valve assembly (36) which may be dropped into a housing with a valve seat (80) in the fuel body (12) and enclosed by cover (72) and spring means (68) to form an integrated system. The unitized assembly (36) can also be used in other applications. Pulsation damping may be provided by a flexible wall (38, 104) of the fuel chamber. The flexible wall may be the pressure regulator diaphragm (38) or a resilient wall (104) designed for the purpose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/46; F02M 55/02; F02M 69/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01); F02M 69/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02M 69/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0011344A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0011344 A1 20000302; AU 5483399 A 20000314; DE 69921610 D1 20041209; DE 69921610 T2 20051020; EP 1045984 A1 20001025; EP 1045984 B1 20041103

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2007-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050813

2005-12-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050813

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921610 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE