Global Patent Index - EP 1045985 A1

EP 1045985 A1 2000-10-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING POWER IN IGNITION SYSTEMS WITH A PRIMARY-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITIING SWITCH

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING POWER IN IGNITION SYSTEMS WITH A PRIMARY-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITIING SWITCH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIEREGELUNG AN ZÜNDSYSTEMEN MIT PRIMÄRSEITIGEM KURZSCHLUSSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION D'ENERGIE DANS DES SYSTEMES D'ALLUMAGE AVEC UN COURT-CIRCUITEUR COTE PRIMAIRE

Publication

EP 1045985 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962038 A

Priority

  • DE 9903413 W
  • DE 19849258 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19849258A1] The method involves measuring the primary current in the short circuit phase of the short circuit switch (4) and passing it to the control unit, which processes it into a characteristic using a function or filter and uses it for energy regulation by controlling the closure time or angle. The closing time or angle is reduced if an excessive rest energy is indicated and vice-versa. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for energy regulation of an ignition system with a primary side short circuit switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 9/00; F02P 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/05 (2006.01); F02P 9/00 (2006.01); F02P 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 9/002 (2013.01); F02P 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0025021A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849258 A1 20000427; EP 1045985 A1 20001025; EP 1045985 B1 20040324; JP 2002528675 A 20020903; US 6298837 B1 20011009; WO 0025021 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908952 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE