Global Patent Index - EP 1045989 A1

EP 1045989 A1 2000-10-25 - HIGH PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

HIGH PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

HOCHDRUCKREINIGUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1045989 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966373 A

Priority

  • DE 19800680 A
  • EP 9808332 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800680A1] The invention relates to a high-pressure cleaning device, comprising a motor and a piston pump driven by said motor. The pistons of the piston pump are elastically located on a swash plate driven by the motor. The device also comprises a motor shaft which is rotationally mounted on both sides and is rigidly connected to the swash plate on one end, in addition to a roller bearing with two concentric bearing rings at the end on the swash plate side, whose outer bearing ring is supported in an end plate of the motor while the inner bearing ring surrounds the motor shaft. The bearing on the swash plate side of the motor shaft is embodied in such a way that the motor shaft and the bearing can be easily assembled and are, to a great extent, independent from unavoidable manufacturing tolerances. To this end, the inner bearing ring loosely surrounds the motor shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/14 (2006.01); F04B 53/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/22 (2013.01); F04B 1/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935397A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800680 A1 19990715; AU 2275099 A 19990726; BR 9814810 A 20001003; DK 1045989 T3 20020527; EP 1045989 A1 20001025; EP 1045989 B1 20020320; US 6499962 B1 20021231; WO 9935397 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803473

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803473

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL