Global Patent Index - EP 1045993 A1

EP 1045993 A1 2000-10-25 - CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR A HYDRAULIC MOTOR

Title (en)

CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR A HYDRAULIC MOTOR

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN HYFRAULIKMOTOR

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1045993 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900441 A

Priority

  • DE 19800722 A
  • DK 9900011 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800722A1] A control arrangement for a hydraulic motor, which is, at least in one working direction, loadable by an external force, with a control valve (3) having in this working direction an inflow control throttle (5) in an inflow path (6), and a return control throttle (7) in a return path (8). Further, a load retaining valve (10) is arranged in the return path (8), which is loaded in the closed position by its outlet pressure (PF) and a spring (11) and in the opening direction by the motor inflow pressure (PA). Besides, means are provided for increasing the pressure drop between load retaining valve (10) and tank connection (T) to a value higher than the pressure drop between pump connection (P) and inflow motor connection (A). This gives a better stabilisation towards oscillations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/18 (2006.01); B66F 9/22 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/003 (2013.01); B66C 13/066 (2013.01); B66C 13/18 (2013.01); B66F 9/22 (2013.01); E02F 9/226 (2013.01); F15B 13/01 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935406A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800722 A1 19990715; DE 19800722 B4 20040819; AU 1960499 A 19990726; EP 1045993 A1 20001025; WO 9935406 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041019

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAUER-DANFOSS HOLDING A/S

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAUER-DANFOSS (NORDEBORG) A/S

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT