Global Patent Index - EP 1046003 A1

EP 1046003 A1 2000-10-25 - CONTROL VALVE FOR A HYDRAULIC MOTOR

Title (en)

CONTROL VALVE FOR A HYDRAULIC MOTOR

Title (de)

STEUERVENTIL EINES HYDROMOTORS

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1046003 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900440 A

Priority

  • DE 19800720 A
  • DK 9900010 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800720A1] A control valve for a hydraulic motor with a slide (3) extending in a housing bore (2), the slide having on both sides of a neutral position working areas, each allocated to a working direction, in which working areas an inflow throttle (14, 15) and approximately at the same time also a return throttle (18, 19) open after passing through a deadband (c). The return throttle (18, 19) is open in the neutral position and closes on passing through the deadband (c). Thus, a pressure-relief valve can drain off pressure fluid to the tank in the neutral position under maintenance of the good control properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 11/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935424A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800720 A1 19990715; DE 19800720 C2 20011031; AU 1960399 A 19990726; EP 1046003 A1 20001025; EP 1046003 B1 20040421; WO 9935424 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110109

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110108

2011-12-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916573

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-09-20 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-07-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAUER-DANFOSS HOLDING APS

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916573 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAUER-DANFOSS HOLDING A/S

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAUER-DANFOSS (NORDEBORG) A/S

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE