Global Patent Index - EP 1046010 A1

EP 1046010 A1 2000-10-25 - FUEL INJECTION ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTOR

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTOR

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GASTURBINENBRENNKAMMER

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE D'INJECTION DE COMBUSTIBLE POUR CHAMBRE A COMBUSTION DE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 1046010 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99970455 A

Priority

  • US 9922661 W
  • US 10364998 P
  • US 39855899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0022347A1] A fuel injection assembly (174) for a gas turbine engine combustor, including at least one fuel stem (186), a plurality of concentrically disposed tubes (192, 194, 196) positioned within each fuel stem, wherein a cooling supply flow passage (198), a cooling return flow passage (200), and a tip fuel flow passage (202) are defined thereby, and at least one fuel tip assembly (190) connected to each fuel stem (186) so as to be in flow communication with the flow passages, wherein an active cooling circuit for each fuel stem (186) and fuel tip assembly (190) is maintained by providing all active fuel through the cooling supply flow passage (198) and the cooling return flow passage (200) during each stage of combustor operation. The fuel flowing through the active cooling circuit is then collected so that a predetermined portion thereof is provided to the tip fuel flow passage (202) for injection by the fuel tip assembly (190).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/36; F23D 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/16 (2006.01); F23D 11/12 (2006.01); F23D 11/36 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/36 (2013.01); F23D 11/402 (2013.01); F23R 3/28 (2013.01); F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0022347A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0022347 A1 20000420; DE 69932318 D1 20060824; DE 69932318 T2 20070705; EP 1046010 A1 20001025; EP 1046010 B1 20060712; JP 2002527708 A 20020827; JP 4323723 B2 20090902

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150929

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150929

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150929

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69932318

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932318 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040129

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE