Global patent index - EP 1046040 A1

EP 1046040 A1 2000-10-25 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC COMPONENT

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1046040 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924707 A

Priority

  • DE 9900934 W
  • DE 19843350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19843350A1] Component comprises a magneto-resistive element (10) that functions as sensor and a second magneto-resistive element (1) that functions as a storage element. The sensor element is in the form of an AMR or GMR (Giant-Magneto-resistance). The storage element is in the form of MRAM cell. (Magnetic random access memory).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01P 3/487; G01D 3/02; G01D 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/105 (2006.01); G01R 33/09 (2006.01); G11C 11/15 (2006.01); G11C 11/16 (2006.01); H01L 21/8246 (2006.01); H01L 27/22 (2006.01); H01L 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/222 (2013.01); B82Y 25/00 (2013.01); G01R 33/093 (2013.01); G11C 11/15 (2013.01); G11C 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0017660A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843350 A1 20000323; AU 4131099 A 20000410; AU 759533 B2 20030417; EP 1046040 A1 20001025; JP 2002525857 A 20020813; US 6534978 B1 20030318; WO 0017660 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040527

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TREUTLER, CHRISTOPH

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOST, FRANZ

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FREITAG, MARTIN

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE