Global Patent Index - EP 1046086 A1

EP 1046086 A1 2000-10-25 - TIMEPIECE AND CHRONOMETER WITH OVERLAPPING, SEPARATELY DRIVEN ANALOG AND DIGITAL DISPLAYS

Title (en)

TIMEPIECE AND CHRONOMETER WITH OVERLAPPING, SEPARATELY DRIVEN ANALOG AND DIGITAL DISPLAYS

Title (de)

UHR UND CHRONOMETER MIT ÜBERLAPPENDEN, GETRENNT ANGETRIEBENEN ANALOG- UND DIGITALANZEIGEN

Title (fr)

MONTRE ET CHRONOMETRE COMPRENANT DES AFFICHAGES ANALOGIQUES ET NUMERIQUES SE CHEVAUCHANT ET ENTRAINES SEPAREMENT

Publication

EP 1046086 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99935990 A

Priority

  • CN 98245340 U
  • US 9917228 W
  • US 29090299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028387A1] A timepiece comprises a watch case (101) with a back (118) and a display area (102), a transparent crystal (104), an electrically-driven LCD digital display (105) for indicating passing seconds, a superimposed analog display comprising an hour hand (108), a minute hand (109), an interior bezel (110), an electrical watch movement (111), and a digital display driver (113).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 25/00; G04C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028387 A1 20000518; AT 309560 T 20051115; AU 5135199 A 20000529; BR 9906725 A 20001017; CA 2316861 A1 20000518; CA 2316861 C 20061017; DE 69928221 D1 20051215; DE 69928221 T2 20060803; EP 1046086 A1 20001025; EP 1046086 A4 20011114; EP 1046086 B1 20051109; ES 2249022 T3 20060316; HK 1031141 A1 20060407; ID 26959 A 20010222; IL 137154 D0 20010724; JP 2002529748 A 20020910; NZ 505360 A 20020828; TR 200001808 T1 20010723

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69928221

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060730

2007-05-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-04-07 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031141

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249022 T3

2006-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-02-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928221 P 20051215

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040224

2001-11-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 04B 25/00 A, 7G 04C 19/00 B, 7G 04G 9/00 B

2001-06-01 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE