Global patent index - EP 1046095 A1

EP 1046095 A1 2000-10-25 - CONTENT SUPPLIED AS SOFTWARE OBJECTS FOR COPYRIGHT PROTECTION

Title (en)

CONTENT SUPPLIED AS SOFTWARE OBJECTS FOR COPYRIGHT PROTECTION

Title (de)

ALS SOFTWARE-OBJEKT DARGESTELLTE INHALTSANGABE ZUM SCHUTZ DES URHEBERRECHTS

Title (fr)

CONTENU FOURNI SOUS FORME D'OBJETS LOGICIELS POUR LA PROTECTION DU DROIT D'AUTEUR

Publication

EP 1046095 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99957978 A

Priority

  • EP 9908333 W
  • US 18953498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028398A1] Content information such as a movie, an audio file or a textual message is supplied to an end-user in a software object that has an encapsulated procedure for end-user access of the content information in a runtime environment. The object can specify time frame for and manner wherein the content information is to be accessed. Since the procedure is encapsulated in the object together with the content data, and since transport of the object over the Internet is done after serializing, an adequate degree of security is provided against unauthorized play-out or copying.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/10 (2013.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G10K 15/02 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/2812 (2013.01); G06F 21/10 (2013.01); H04L 2012/2849 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0028398A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028398 A1 20000518; CN 1124534 C 20031015; CN 1292897 A 20010425; EP 1046095 A1 20001025; JP 2002529844 A 20020910

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE