Global Patent Index - EP 1046106 A1

EP 1046106 A1 2000-10-25 - METHOD FOR GENERALISED TRIGGERING OF ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS ON A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTER SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERALISED TRIGGERING OF ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS ON A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTER SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERALLGEMEINERTEN EINFÜHRUNG VON VERWALTUNGSHANDLUNGEN IN EINEM VERTEILTEN RECHNERSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DECLENCHEMENT GENERALISE D'ACTIONS D'ADMINISTRATIONS SUR UN SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE DISTRIBUE

Publication

EP 1046106 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99954085 A

Priority

  • FR 9902730 W
  • FR 9814150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785691A1] The invention concerns a method for generalised triggering of administrative action on a distributed computer system managed by a software manager (30) using an information base stored in storage means and objects defining a main domain (D0) comprising at least two subdomains (D1, D2), each subdomain (D1, D2) comprising a group of machines (20, 40) and/or at least of another subdomain (21, 41). The invention is characterised in that the method comprises an initialising step comprising: a first associating and storing step wherein each action for administering the main domain is associated with a specific action, for each subdomain (D1, D2) the different specific actions having the same functionality corresponding to the performance of the administrative action; a second step which consists in creating and storing for each specific action at least a named set of parameters (P1, P'1, P2, P'2) comprising the parameters required for implementing the specific action, each name the parameter set being identical for all the specific actions of one common administrative action; and an implementing step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/455; H04L 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/0816 (2013.01); H04L 41/0893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0028417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785691 A1 20000512; FR 2785691 B1 20001215; EP 1046106 A1 20001025; WO 0028417 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVIDIAN

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE