Global patent index - EP 1046148 A1

EP 1046148 A1 2000-10-25 - SIGNALING FIRE DETECTOR

Title (en)

SIGNALING FIRE DETECTOR

Title (de)

BRANDMELDER

Title (fr)

AVERTISSEUR D'INCENDIE

Publication

EP 1046148 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955825 A

Priority

  • DE 9903156 W
  • DE 19845553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845553A1] The invention relates to a signaling fire detector comprising a sensor (10), said sensor having at least one conventional fire detecting sensor (12, 13), and comprising a control and analyzing unit (9). Said unit is connected to the sensor (10), is configured for analyzing the signal (S2, S3) supplied by the at least one fire detecting sensor, and is optionally configured for outputting at least one control signal (T1; T2) for the fire detecting sensor(s) (12, 13). The inventive signaling fire detector is characterized in that the sensor (10) additionally comprises a chemosensor (11) or a chemosensor array which is likewise connected to the control and analyzing unit (9) for analyzing a detection signal (S1), and which is configured based on a chemical sensor operating principle for detecting gas and/or smoke emissions produced by fire. The additional chemosensor is preferably an optoelectronic gas sensor which operates on the basis of an optode or is preferably an optoelectronic gas sensor array which also operates on the basis of an optode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/64 (2006.01); G01J 1/42 (2006.01); G01N 21/53 (2006.01); G01N 21/75 (2006.01); G08B 17/00 (2006.01); G08B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0021046A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845553 A1 20000413; DE 19845553 C2 20031016; DE 59914659 D1 20080403; EP 1046148 A1 20001025; EP 1046148 B1 20080220; JP 2002526871 A 20020820; US 2003201899 A1 20031030; US 6696939 B2 20040224; WO 0021046 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080220

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2008-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914659

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-02-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020711

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE