Global patent index - EP 1046200 A1

EP 1046200 A1 2000-10-25 - ELECTRIC CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1046200 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906115 A

Priority

  • EP 9900117 W
  • IT TO980011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935717A1] An electric connector (1) having an insulating casing (3) defining a number of cavities (6) for housing respective electric terminals (7); a retaining lever (35) carried by the casing (3) and having a first retaining tooth (37) which snaps onto a second retaining tooth (36) carried by a connecting element (1') connectable to the connector (1); and connecting means (34) connecting the retaining lever (35) in oscillating manner to the casing (3) to enable release of the first and second retaining tooth (37, 36) and disconnection of the connector (1) and the connecting element (1'); the connecting means (34) having a beam element (38), which is fitted integrally at opposite ends to an outer wall (11) of the casing (3), carries the retaining lever (35), and extends crosswise to the retaining lever (35).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6272 (2013.01); H01R 23/27 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935717 A1 19990715; AT 216806 T 20020515; BR 9907232 A 20001017; DE 69901330 D1 20020529; DE 69901330 T2 20021024; EP 1046200 A1 20001025; EP 1046200 B1 20020424; IT TO980011 A1 19990709

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030111

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216806

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB SE