Global Patent Index - EP 1046208 A1

EP 1046208 A1 2000-10-25 - ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRISCHE APPARATUR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE POUR APPAREILLAGE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1046208 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99942964 A

Priority

  • FR 9902180 W
  • FR 9811417 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783367A1] The system comprises a number of generators (14) and transformers (16). The generated supply storage means (20) that actively adapts the generated charge such that the supply to the equipment (10) is stable and is free of spikes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02J 3/38; H02J 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02J 9/06 (2006.01); H02J 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02J 3/30 (2013.01); Y02E 60/16 (2013.01); Y10T 307/50 (2015.04); Y10T 307/625 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0016461A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783367 A1 20000317; FR 2783367 B1 20020510; EP 1046208 A1 20001025; JP 2002526010 A 20020813; US 6188143 B1 20010213; WO 0016461 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090507

2007-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE