Global Patent Index - EP 1046253 A1

EP 1046253 A1 2000-10-25 - VIDEO PROGRAM BEARING TRANSPORT STREAM REMULTIPLEXER

Title (en)

VIDEO PROGRAM BEARING TRANSPORT STREAM REMULTIPLEXER

Title (de)

NEUMULTIPLEXER VON VIDEOPROGRAMMEN TRAGENDER TRANSPORTSTROM

Title (fr)

REMULTIPLEXEUR DE FLUX DE TRANSPORT SUPPORTANT UN PROGRAMME VIDEO

Publication

EP 1046253 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900800 A

Priority

  • US 9900360 W
  • US 721198 A
  • US 721298 A
  • US 733498 A
  • US 720398 A
  • US 720498 A
  • US 721098 A
  • US 696398 A
  • US 696498 A
  • US 719898 A
  • US 719998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937048A1] A method and system (30, 30', 100, 100', 100'', 100''') remultiplex video program bearing data (TS1-TS5, TS10-TS20), using a descriptor based system (122, 124, 129-4) for timely outputting transport packets, using a descriptor and transport packet caching technique (116, 122, 124, 114) for decoupling the synchronous receipt and transmission of transport packets from any asynchronous processing (160, 120, 130, S2, 402, S4, 404), using descriptors for managing scrambling and descrambling control words (129-9), optimizing bandwidth of transport streams by replacing null transport packets with transport packet data, and using a technique (180) for locking multiple internal reference clock generators (113).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04J 3/24; H04K 1/00; H04L 9/18; H04L 12/56; H04N 7/10; H04N 7/12; H04N 7/24; H04N 7/52; H04N 7/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04J 3/00 (2006.01); H04K 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/18 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/23608 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937048 A1 19990722; AU 2030499 A 19990802; AU 761704 B2 20030605; BR 9906963 A 20011030; CA 2318415 A1 19990722; CA 2318415 C 20091215; CN 100380853 C 20080409; CN 1293845 A 20010502; EP 1046253 A1 20001025; EP 1046253 A4 20050511; HK 1036172 A1 20081224; IL 137277 A 20061005; IL 137277 D0 20010724; JP 2002510162 A 20020402; NO 20003599 A 20000913; NO 20003599 D0 20000713; NO 20084376 A 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERICSSON TELEVISION INC.

2008-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081030

2005-05-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 3/24 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 9/18 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04K 1/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/10 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/12 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/52 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/24 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/58 B

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL