Global Patent Index - EP 1046287 A1

EP 1046287 A1 2000-10-25 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME AND SOFTWARE RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (en)

PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME AND SOFTWARE RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (de)

TRAGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT, ENTSPRECHENDES KONTROLLVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMMAUFZEICHUNGSMEDIUM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE PORTATIF, MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE LOGICIEL

Publication

EP 1046287 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99954395 A

Priority

  • JP 9906163 W
  • JP 31658098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028732A1] There can be obtained a medium on which a remote-control information is recorded and a portable electronic device serving as a remote control operation device for transferring the information. A portable electronic device is one that can be connected to a host machine (1) having a program executing function and that includes an input and output function and a processing function independent from the host machine (1). The portable electronic device (100) also includes means (46) for storing remote control operation information that has been transferred from a recording medium in the host machine (1), a control means (41) for executing remote control operation programs, and means (130) for displaying the remote control operation information in accordance with the remote control operation program. The remote control operation information is displayed in accordance with a hierarchical structure of operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/445; A63F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2006.01); H04N 5/445 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/323 (2014.09); A63F 13/12 (2013.01); A63F 13/92 (2014.09); H04N 5/44582 (2013.01); H04N 21/42204 (2013.01); A63F 2300/206 (2013.01); A63F 2300/403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0028732A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028732 A1 20000518; AU 1077500 A 20000529; BR 9909198 A 20001031; CA 2317685 A1 20000518; CN 1288636 A 20010321; EP 1046287 A1 20001025; JP 2002530017 A 20020910; RU 2000120680 A 20020727; TW 448638 B 20010801

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-06-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031072

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061030

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE