Global patent index - EP 1046300 A1

EP 1046300 A1 2000-10-25 - IMPROVED PREDICTION OF DC OR AC COEFFICIENTS

Title (en)

IMPROVED PREDICTION OF DC OR AC COEFFICIENTS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE PRÄDIKTION DER DC-bzw. AC-KOEFFIZIENTEN

Title (fr)

PREDICTION AMELIOREE DES COEFFICIENTS DC OU AC

Publication

EP 1046300 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99959188 A

Priority

  • DE 9903230 W
  • DE 19846866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19846866A1] The invention relates to method and device for reducing the volume of data, especially for image coding (300) and decoding (400) according to the MPEG 4 standard, in a chronological series of data that is to be coded and decoded, whereby said data is divided up into partial data (10, 20), especially image blocks, during coding. Prediction values (250) are produced by means of a quasi-division. Said prediction values (250) are formed from the sum of a first (230) and second approximation (240).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H03M 7/30 (2006.01); H03M 7/36 (2006.01); H04N 19/60 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/60 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 19/63 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0022827A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846866 A1 20000504; EP 1046300 A1 20001025; JP 2002528004 A 20020827; WO 0022827 A2 20000420; WO 0022827 A3 20000720

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110503

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071220

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE