Global Patent Index - EP 1046362 A1

EP 1046362 A1 2000-10-25 - Presentation system for floor coverings or similar

Title (en)

Presentation system for floor coverings or similar

Title (de)

Präsentationssystem zur Darstellung eines Oberbelags

Title (fr)

Système de presentation de revêtements de sol ou similaires

Publication

EP 1046362 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105749 A

Priority

DE 29907073 U

Abstract (en)

A sample of the covering is made up of segments (2) placed flat against each other like tiles and stuck onto the display sur through magnets. The display surface is magnetizable and the segments are made of plastics with a permanent magnet coating on th reverse side. The surface of the segments can be any design or color.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Präsentationssystem zur Darstellung eines Oberbelags zur Beschichtung von Boden und/oder Wand und/oder Decke, mit einer Fläche, auf die eine Nachbildung des Oberbelags aufgebracht wird, wobei die Fläche magnetisierbar ist, der dargestellte Oberbelag aus flächig ausgeführten Segmenten (2), nach Art von Fliesen oder Kacheln, zusammengesetzt ist, die Segmente (2) dauermagnetisch sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/00; G09F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907073 U1 19990715; EP 1046362 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI