Global Patent Index - EP 1046368 A1

EP 1046368 A1 2000-10-25 - SANITARY PULL-FILM PAD DEVICE FOR TOILET

Title (en)

SANITARY PULL-FILM PAD DEVICE FOR TOILET

Title (de)

SCHUTZABDECKUNG FÜR TOILETTENBRILLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF OFFRANT UNE PROTECTION DE LUNETTE DE WC

Publication

EP 1046368 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952499 A

Priority

  • CN 9800263 W
  • CN 98200398 U

Abstract (en)

A pull-film pad cover is fixed on the internal surface of a toilet lid, and pull-film pads are mounted on the pull film pad cover. A hollow rope channel is formed at the out periphery of each pull-film pad. Two ends of the rope extend out from the two ends of the hollow channel, and the middle of the rope extends from the middle opening of the hollow channel and becomes a rope knot which may be fixed on the locking seat which is fixed on the front of the toilet. The pull-film pad cover comprises a loop plate of the same shape as the pull-film pad, where an outside edge extend along the outside of the loop plate and an inside circle extends along the inside of the loop plate.

A sanitary pull-film pad device for toilet includes a locking peg fixed on front side of toilet bowl, a pull-film pad cover fixed on underside of toilet lid and a number of pull-film pads mounted on the pull-film pad cover. A hollow rope channel is provided at the outer periphery of each pull-film pad. A rope is extended in the hollow rope channel. Two ends of the rope are extended outside from the two ends of hollow rope channel, whereas the middle end of rope is extended outside from middle opening of hollow rope channel and becomes a knot which may be fixed on the locking peg. The pull-film pad cover comprises a loop plate whose contour is the same as the pull-film pad, an outside edge along outer edge extended along the outside of loop plate and an inside circle extended along inside of loop plate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934719 A1 19990715; AU 1019599 A 19990726; CN 2322528 Y 19990609; EP 1046368 A1 20001025; EP 1046368 A4 20040414

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030345

2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051028

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-04-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 13/16 A

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE