Global patent index - EP 1046384 A2

EP 1046384 A2 2000-10-25 - Wheelchair with pushing aid

Title (en)

Wheelchair with pushing aid

Title (de)

Rollstuhl mit einer Schiebehilfe

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant avec aide de poussée

Publication

EP 1046384 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107443 A

Priority

DE 19918605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918605C1] The drive unit (8) is part of a pinion vertically pivotable around a rotary axis (D1) crossways to the direction of travel and connected to the frame (3) of the wheelchair (1). To increase the pressure force on the drive wheels (12) by a person accompanying the wheelchair a push bar (20) is provided. In a vertical direction, the push bar is pivotable by a lever arm (21) around a rotary axis (D2) in the area of the rear end of the wheelchair. On the lever arm a pressure bar (22) engages with its upper end, the lower end of which is articulatedly connected with the pinion supporting the drive unit (8).

Abstract (de)

Ein Rollstuhl mit einer als Schiebehilfe 2 ausgebildeten, an dem Rollstuhl 1 durch Zusammenwirken von ersten und zweiten Verbindungmitteln 14, 18, 19 montierbaren, zumindest ein Antriebsrad 12 umfassenden An triebseinheit 8, die Teil einer um eine in Querrichtung zur Fahrtrichtung angeordnete Drehachse D1 vertikal schwenkbaren, am Gestell 3 des Rollstuhles 1 angelenkten Schwinge ist dadurch bestimmt, daß zum bedarfweisen Erhöhen des Anpreßdruckes auf das oder die Antriebsräder 12 durch eine Begleitperson der Rollstuhl 1 eine Schiebestange 20 aufweist, die in vertikaler Richtung über einen Hebelarm 21 schwenkbar umeine im Bereich des hinteren Endes des Rollstuhles 1 befindliche Drehachse D2 angelenkt ist, an welchem Hebelarm 21 eine Druckstange 22 mit ihrem oberen Ende angreift, deren unteres Ende gelenkig mit der die Antriebseinheit 8 tragenden Schwinge verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/047 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 592427 A 18971026

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20003481 U1 20000621; DE 19918605 C1 20000316; EP 1046384 A2 20001025; EP 1046384 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050107

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041207

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI