Global Patent Index - EP 1046384 A3

EP 1046384 A3 2000-11-15 - Wheelchair with pushing aid

Title (en)

Wheelchair with pushing aid

Title (de)

Rollstuhl mit einer Schiebehilfe

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant avec aide de poussée

Publication

EP 1046384 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107443 A

Priority

DE 19918605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918605C1] The drive unit (8) is part of a pinion vertically pivotable around a rotary axis (D1) crossways to the direction of travel and connected to the frame (3) of the wheelchair (1). To increase the pressure force on the drive wheels (12) by a person accompanying the wheelchair a push bar (20) is provided. In a vertical direction, the push bar is pivotable by a lever arm (21) around a rotary axis (D2) in the area of the rear end of the wheelchair. On the lever arm a pressure bar (22) engages with its upper end, the lower end of which is articulatedly connected with the pinion supporting the drive unit (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20003481 U1 20000621; DE 19918605 C1 20000316; EP 1046384 A2 20001025; EP 1046384 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050107

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI