Global Patent Index - EP 1046425 A1

EP 1046425 A1 2000-10-25 - DUST-COLLECTING ELEMENT FOR AIR-CLEANING APPARATUS

Title (en)

DUST-COLLECTING ELEMENT FOR AIR-CLEANING APPARATUS

Title (de)

STAUB KOLLEKTOR ELEMENT FÜR LUFTREINIGER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT COLLECTEUR DE POUSSIERES DESTINE A UN APPAREIL D'EPURATION DE L'AIR

Publication

EP 1046425 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947830 A

Priority

  • JP 9804596 W
  • JP 28229597 A

Abstract (en)

A dust-collecting element (24) is detachably attached to an air-cleaning apparatus body (12) and is provided with an ionizing unit (22) for electrically charging dust in the air and a filter (23d) serving as a dust-collecting unit. A cassette unit (31a) for supporting the filter (23d) is formed integrally with the casing (31) of the ionizing unit (22). On one surface of the casing (31) of the ionizing unit (22) are arranged a number of ionizing lines (33) and a number of pairs of opposing electrodes (32a) oppositely arranged and sandwiching the ionizing lines (33). On the other surface of the casing (31) is provided a cassette unit (31a) for supporting the filter (23d).

Disclosed is a dust collecting element (24) which is attachable to and detachable from an air cleaner main body (12) and comprises an ionization section (22) for charging dust in air and a filter (23d) serving as a dust collection section. A cassette section (31a) for supporting the filter (23d) is integrally formed with a casing (31) of the ionization section (22). Specifically, a plurality of ionization wires (33) and a plurality of pairs of opposite electrode plates (32a) arranged opposite to each other with the ionization wire (33) interposed therebetween are arranged on one surface of the casing (31) of the ionization section (22), and the cassette section (31a) for supporting the filter (23d) is provided on another surface of the casing (31). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/10 (2006.01); B03C 3/12 (2006.01); B03C 3/155 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/155 (2013.01); B03C 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046425 A1 20001025; EP 1046425 A4 20010704; EP 1046425 B1 20040804; AU 725022 B2 20001005; AU 9459798 A 19990503; CN 1170638 C 20041013; CN 1275930 A 20001206; DE 69825486 D1 20040909; DE 69825486 T2 20050728; ES 2226174 T3 20050316; JP 3360582 B2 20021224; JP H11114444 A 19990427; TW 453897 B 20010911; WO 9919072 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101013

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-09-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69825486

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226174 T3

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825486 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-07-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 03C 3/14 A, 7B 03C 3/155 B, 7B 03C 3/019 B, 7B 03C 3/12 B

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT