Global Patent Index - EP 1046432 A1

EP 1046432 A1 2000-10-25 - Article sorting arrangement, in particular for grouping into batches

Title (en)

Article sorting arrangement, in particular for grouping into batches

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Sortieren von Gegenständen, insbesondere zum gruppenweisen Aufteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tri de produits, notamment pour de la mise en lots

Publication

EP 1046432 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00460028 A

Priority

FR 9905062 A

Abstract (en)

The system comprises of an endless conveyor (1) that has a series of equally spaced apertures (12) between which are located product placement areas (11). Retractable paddle boards (3) are provided that can be placed in the product path such that they c be removed from the main conveyor on to a reception station (20) through the conveyor apertures.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif comprend un convoyeur (1) pour transporter des produits (P) afin de les acheminer sélectivement en n postes de réception (2). Le convoyeur (1) comporte une bande sans fin (10) présentant une succession d'ouvertures (12) séparées par des zones pleines (11) propres à recevoir des produits (P), et chaque poste (2) comprend un support de réception de produit (20) disposé sous le brin de transport (1a), et un moyen d'arrêt (3) sélectivement déplaçable au-dessus de la bande (10), pour sélectivement arrêter les produits (P) arrivant afin qu'ils chutent dans l'ouverture (12) située derrière, sur le support (20) au poste de réception (2) correspondant. Application au conditionnement en lots de tranches du saumon fumé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046432 A1 20001025; EP 1046432 B1 20030305; DE 60001514 D1 20030410; DE 60001514 T2 20031113; DK 1046432 T3 20030331; ES 2193928 T3 20031116; FR 2792228 A1 20001020; FR 2792228 B1 20010713

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193928 T3

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60001514 P 20030410

2003-03-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT SE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI