Global patent index - EP 1046435 A4

EP 1046435 A4 2001-04-18 - PIERCING MILL AND METHOD OF CHANGING CANNON

Title (en)

PIERCING MILL AND METHOD OF CHANGING CANNON

Title (de)

LOCHWALZWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUM WECHSELN DES EINLAUFFFÜHRUNGSROHRES

Title (fr)

LAMINOIR PERCEUR ET PROCEDE DE CHANGEMENT DE CANON

Publication

EP 1046435 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98947809 A

Priority

  • JP 9804572 W
  • JP 27890497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046435A1] The piercing mill includes device for turning and moving a cannon holder for holding a cannon and device for sliding the cannon holder along a pass line. The cannon holder is turned and slid on the pass line and is clamped at a predetermined position. The cannon changing method comprises turning a cannon holder, which holds the cannon vertically, on a pass line, and then sliding the cannon holder on the pass line, and clamping it to the main body of a piercing mill.

[origin: EP1046435A1] A piercing mill and cannon exchange method therefor which can automate exchange of a cannon and can cope with flexible production of a variety of differently-sized seamless steel tubes in small quantities. The piercing mill including means for pivoting a cannon holder which holds a cannon and means for sliding the cannon holder along a pass line, through combined above-mentioned means, the cannon holder is pivoted so as to come into alignment with the pass line, is slid along the pass line, and is clamped at a predetermined location. The cannon exchange is characterized in that a cannon holder which retains the cannon in the direction perpendicular to the pass line is pivoted so as to come into alignment with the pass line, is slid along the pass line, and is then clamped to the main frame of the piercing mill. Therefore, it become possible to automate exchange of a cannon in accordance with a changeover and to considerably reduce working hours. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 19/04 (2006.01); B21B 23/00 (2006.01); B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B21B 39/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 19/04 (2013.01); B21B 39/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9919090A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046435 A1 20001025; EP 1046435 A4 20010418; EP 1046435 B1 20040114; DE 69821138 D1 20040219; DE 69821138 T2 20041021; JP 3297994 B2 20020702; JP H11114609 A 19990427; WO 9919090 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151006

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69821138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69821138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69821138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE