Global Patent Index - EP 1046439 A2

EP 1046439 A2 2000-10-25 - Roll for a radial thread rolling head

Title (en)

Roll for a radial thread rolling head

Title (de)

Rolle für einen Radialgewinderollkopf

Title (fr)

Rouleau pour tête radiale à rouler des filets

Publication

EP 1046439 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101837 A

Priority

DE 29907128 U

Abstract (en)

The roller has a ring-shaped circumferential groove section (14) located in one longitudinal half in a radial plane, except a flat section. A thread forming profile (10,12) is formed on both sides of the groove section. The profiles have opposite pitch, the flat sections coincide. The profile sections have a different lift and different diameters.

Abstract (de)

Rolle für einen Radialgewinderollkopf, die an ihrem Umfang ein Gewindeformprofil mit einer Abflachung, einem Gewindeeinlaufabschnitt, einem Gewindekalibrierabschnitt und einem Gewindeauslaufabschnitt aufweist, wobei in der Längshälfte der Rolle in einer Radialebene außer in der Abflachung am Umfang ein ringförmig umlaufender Nutabschnitt geformt ist und auf beiden Seiten des Nutabschnitts ein Gewindeformprofil eingeformt ist, wobei die Steigung der Gewindeformprofile entgegengesetzt und die Lage der Abflachungen übereinstimmend ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907128 U1 19990715; EP 1046439 A2 20001025; EP 1046439 A3 20020626; EP 1046439 B1 20031210; ES 2209693 T3 20040701; US 6298703 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080130

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209693 T3

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004689 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI