Global Patent Index - EP 1046442 A1

EP 1046442 A1 2000-10-25 - Method and machine for continuous casting of thin slabs

Title (en)

Method and machine for continuous casting of thin slabs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stranggiessen von Dünnbrammen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la coulée continue de brames minces

Publication

EP 1046442 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107872 A

Priority

JP 11298199 A

Abstract (en)

A method of casting a thin-slab cast strip with a continuous casting machine of a vertical bending type. The method comprises bending the cast strip drawn out of a mould (1) in a bending zone with simultaneous liquid core reduction in an unsolidified state. The continuous casting apparatus comprises: (1) the liquid core reduction-roll segment (4) comprising a group of fixed rolls (8) disposed outside the guide roll radius bent of a cast strip and a group of movable rolls (3) positioned inside the guide roll radius; (2) the group of movable rolls is supported by a tilting frame guide roll radius (7) with a oil-hydraulic cylinder (10) which moves toward and away from the group of fixed rolls.

The object of the invention is to provide a continuous casting method and a continuous casting machine for producing thin-slab cast strips stably. A continuous casting machine of a vertical bending type for casting thin-slab cast strips, wherein a liquid core reduction-roll segment 4 is provided so as to constitute rolls in the bending zone B below the mold 1. The liquid core reduction-roll segment 4 comprises a group of fixed rolls 8 disposed outside the guide roll radius being bent of a cast strip and a group of movable rolls 3 disposed inside the guide roll radius. The group of movable rolls 3 is supported by a tilting frame guide roll radius 7 with an oil-hydraulic cylinder 10 so that it is moved toward the group of fixed rolls 8 to roll the cast strip. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046442 A1 20001025; JP 2000301303 A 20001031; JP 3355311 B2 20021209

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI