Global Patent Index - EP 1046463 A2

EP 1046463 A2 2000-10-25 - Gauging head for stone materials

Title (en)

Gauging head for stone materials

Title (de)

Planierschleifkopf für Gesteinmaterialien

Title (fr)

Tête d'aplanissage pour matériaux pierreux

Publication

EP 1046463 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830177 A

Priority

IT FI990093 A

Abstract (en)

The head has a number of tools (5) mounted on corresponding shafts and supported by a rotating case (8), the carter (8) being kinematically connected to a driving shaft (1), so as to draw a motion from there, with a predetermined angular velocity. To the driving shaft are kinematically connected also the shaft of the tools, which derive their own motion from the same shaft with an angular velocity different from that of the case. The case is connected to the driving shaft via a round-per-minute reducer located inside the same head, the tools being connected to the driving shaft via a round-per-minute overgear.

Gauging head for stone materials, comprising a plurality of tools (5) mounted on corresponding shafts supported by a rotating case (8), said carter (8) being kinematically connected to a driving shaft (1) so as to draw a motion therefrom having a predetermined angular velocity; also kinematically connected to said shaft are the shafts of said tools (5), which derive their own motion from the same shaft (1) with an angular velocity different from that of the case (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/22; B24B 41/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2013.01); B24B 27/0061 (2013.01); B24B 41/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046463 A2 20001025; EP 1046463 A3 20020410; EP 1046463 B1 20040721; CN 1127397 C 20031112; CN 1270875 A 20001025; DE 60012258 D1 20040826; ES 2225070 T3 20050316; IT 1307863 B1 20011119; IT FI990044 U3 20001020; IT FI990044 V0 19990420; IT FI990093 A1 20001021; IT FI990093 A3 20001020; IT FI990093 D0 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070313

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041221

2006-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2225070

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012258

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT PT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI