Global Patent Index - EP 1046467 A1

EP 1046467 A1 2000-10-25 - Polishing machine with rotating head carrying a plurality of polishing sectors having a segmented and resilient structure

Title (en)

Polishing machine with rotating head carrying a plurality of polishing sectors having a segmented and resilient structure

Title (de)

Poliermaschine mit einem Drehkopf der eine Vielzahl von Poliersektoren mit segmentierten und elastischen Strukturen trägt

Title (fr)

Machine de polissage comprenant une tête de polissage portant une pluralité de secteurs de polissage ayant une structure segmentée et élastique

Publication

EP 1046467 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830221 A

Priority

EP 99830221 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has at least a rotating head (1) connected through a flange (2) to the end of a drive shaft and with a working facing which carries grinding sectors (3), hingedly held in brackets (4), and connect to the head at uniformly spaced angular positions. The sectors are an aggregate of abrasive particles and a bonding resin, with a cylindrical working face whose geometric axis lies on a plane normal to the head rotation axis, and a shank portion shaped to fit into a receiving bracket slot. Each grinding sector has a laminated structure with a shaped shank of a rigid material and mechanically resistant to fit in the slot, at least a resilient pad at least partly of elastomer interposed between a face of the shank and an aggregate abrasive body. The abrasive body has the cylindrical working surface defined by end faces of as many protrusions of aggregate rising from a relatively thin and flexible base layer of the aggregate incorporating reinforcing fibers.

A polishing machine comprises at least a rotating head (1), connected through a flange (2) to the end of a drive shaft, the working face of the rotating head carrying a plurality of grinding sectors (3), held in hingedly brackets (4), connected to the rotating head (1) at uniformly spaced angular positions, each grinding sector (3) being of an aggregate of abrasive particles and of a bonding resin having a cylindrical working face whose geometric axis lies on a plane normal to the axis of rotation of the head (1) and a shank portion shaped to fit into a receiving slot of the holding bracket (4). Each grinding sectors (3) has a laminated structure including a shaped shank (5) of a rigid material and mechanically resistant to fit in the receiving slot, at least a resilient pad, at least partly of elastomer (6, 8) interposed between a face of said shank (5) and an aggregate abrasive body (9, 10) having said cylindrical working face defined by a plurality of end faces of as many protrusions (9) of aggregate, rising from a relatively thin or flexible base layer (10) of said aggregate, incorporating reinforcing fibers. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 17/00; B24B 41/047; B24D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/047 (2006.01); B24D 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 99/005 (2013.01); B24B 41/0475 (2013.01); B24D 7/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

"FIMAD DIGITAL PHOTOGRAPHS", DIGITAL PHOTOGRAPHS, XX, XX, 16 April 1999 (1999-04-16), XX, pages 01 - 03, XP002949338

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046467 A1 20001025; EP 1046467 B1 20030129; DE 69905135 D1 20030306; DE 69905135 T2 20030605; ES 2188122 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-31 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-08-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-08 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECNOSINT S.R.L

- Effective date: 20031017

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIALINE S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SWEDIAM S.R.L

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECNOSINT S.R.L

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIALINE S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-12-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECNOSINT S.R.L

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188122 T3

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905135 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT PT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI