Global patent index - EP 1046469 A3

EP 1046469 A3 2001-03-14 - Apparatus for assembling and dismantling spring/shock absorber units for vehicle suspensions

Title (en)

Apparatus for assembling and dismantling spring/shock absorber units for vehicle suspensions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für den Zusammenbau oder das Zerlegen von Feder/Stossdämpfer-Einheiten für Fahrzeugaufhängungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'assemblage et démontage d'unités ressort/amortisseur pour suspensions de véhicule

Publication

EP 1046469 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108416 A

Priority

IT TO990325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046469A2] The apparatus (1) is disposed with its axis (H) significantly spaced from the general axis (A) of its elongated structure in such a way that the shock absorber (G) lies alongside an actuator cylinder (5), of the structure, so that there is a completely free maneuvering space at the end of the unit opposite the cylinder.

[origin: EP1046469A2] Apparatus for assembly and dismantling spring/shock absorber units for vehicle suspensions includes an elongate structure comprising a slidable stem (11) of an actuator device (5) and two abutment members (13, 15) intended to engage respective portions of a spring (M) of a spring/shock absorber (G) one of which (15) is connected to the stem (11). A pair of engagement elements (18, 28) disposed on the opposite sides from the abutment members (13, 15) with respect to the unit (G) are able to engage opposite portions of the spring (M), one of such elements (28) being connected to the stem (11). The engagement elements (18, 28) are movable transversely of the general axis (A) so that they can be introduced between a pair of turns of the spring (M). The spring/shock absorber unit can be engaged by the apparatus (1) with its axis (H) spaced from the general axis (A) and with the shock absorber (S) alongside the actuator (5) so that there is a completely free manoeuvring space at the end of the spring/shock absorber unit (G) opposite the actuator (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/304 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046469 A2 20001025; EP 1046469 A3 20010314; IT 1308450 B1 20011217; IT TO990325 A1 20001023; IT TO990325 D0 19990423

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010915

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYTEK SRL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI