Global Patent Index - EP 1046477 A2

EP 1046477 A2 2000-10-25 - Gauge punch

Title (en)

Gauge punch

Title (de)

Locher und Lehre

Title (fr)

Perforateur avec gabarit

Publication

EP 1046477 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118051 A

Priority

JP 11364899 A

Abstract (en)

The punch has a gauge (2) holding a paper (1) via a link member (10) being associated with a paper holding portion (8) which is held opened by hooking the link member with a link hook of an engaging portion. A punch (3) is positioned to the gauge by a paper positioner and pierces the paper, via punch members (23) for the desired filing holes. The paper holding mechanism is held while the paper holding portion is kept open and by pushing the paper holding portion, the paper is held.

There is provided a gauge punch capable of holding a paper (1) easily while carrying a gauge (2) in one hand. The link member (10) on which the projection is formed is connected to the paper holding means and the projection is hooked with the predetermined position formed on the base plate (5). Thus being constructed, the paper holding means is kept opened while the projection (16) of the link member (10) is hooked with the hooking portion of the engaging portion (14), whereby, since by pushing the paper holding portion the projection is released from being hooked with the hooking portion (19), the paper holding portion holds the paper, the gauge (2) can easily hold the paper while carrying the gauge in hand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; B26D 7/02; B26F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/32 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/02 (2006.01); B26F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/015 (2013.01); B26D 7/025 (2013.01); B26F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046477 A2 20001025; EP 1046477 A3 20030108; EP 1046477 B1 20040818; AT 273775 T 20040915; CN 1159140 C 20040728; CN 1270879 A 20001025; DE 69919507 D1 20040923; JP 2000301497 A 20001031; JP 4161148 B2 20081008

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041118

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919507

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI