Global Patent Index - EP 1046482 A1

EP 1046482 A1 2000-10-25 - Carcase clamp

Title (en)

Carcase clamp

Title (de)

Korpuspresse

Title (fr)

Presse à carcasses

Publication

EP 1046482 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107838 A

Priority

EP 99107838 A

Abstract (en)

The carcass press consists of an upright frame (1) which has a front and reverse side. A vertical pair of press-plates consi of a lower (6) and upper (7) press plate which protrude from the front of the frame. The upper side plate is vertically adjustab by means of a drive mechanism and is supported on the frame; the lower press-plate is rigidly joined to the frame. A horizontal of press-plates both protrude from the front of the frame and are each movable by means of horizontally movable supports (10,11) the frame by a drive mechanism in the space in-between the vertical pair of press-plates.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Korpuspresse zum Zusammenfügen und Pressen von einzelnen Korpusteilen zu Möbelkorpussen, wie beispielsweise ein Hoch-, Ober- oder Unterschrank. Die Korpuspresse umfasst einen verwindungssteifen, aufrechtstehenden Ständerrahmen (1) mit einer Vorder- und einer Rückseite und ein vom Ständerrahmen (1) vorderseitig vorstehendes Senkrechtpresswangenpaar mit einer unteren (6) und einer oberen Presswange (7). Eine (7) der Presswangen ist mittels eines Antriebs vertikal verstellbar und stützt sich am Ständerrahmen (1) ab. Die andere (6) ist mit dem Ständerrahmen (6) starr verbunden. Ferner ist ein Waagrechtpresswangenpaar mit einer rechten (8) und einer linken Presswange (9) vorhanden, die beide vom Ständerrahmen (1) vorderseitig vorstehen. Diese Presswangen (8, 9) sind jeweils über am Ständerrahmen (1) mittels eines Antriebs waagrecht verfahrbaren Supporten (10, 11) in dem Zwischenraum zwischen dem Senkrechtpresswangenpaar (6, 7) verfahrbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046482 A1 20001025; EP 1046482 B1 20031119; AT 254525 T 20031215; DE 59907799 D1 20031224; ES 2207883 T3 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130716

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120420

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907799

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 254525 T

- Effective date: 20120420

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110405

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207883 T3

2004-01-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LIGMATECH AUTOMATIONSSYSTEME GMBH

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907799 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI